top of page
best abacus classes in uk

Learn Abacus Mental Maths

Abbacus calculation

Faster Calculation

Abacus benefits

Love for Math

Memory development by Abacus

Sharper Memory

online abacus learning classes

1:1Class

Highly Interactive Online Abacus Classes

For 5 to 15 Years old

824 x 18 = ?
634 / 23 = ?
28.73 + 46.92 = ?

Learn Abacus Mental Math

For 5 to 15 Years Kids

abacus classes in ireland

How to Solve in Seconds?

Child becomes a Maths Prodigy
#Learn-from-home

An image with a picture of mother and child showing features of one to one online Abacus classes by ReLearn education
Lower 02.jpg

Benefits for Children

  • Develop Love for Math

  • Become 6x Faster in Math

  • Do Mental Calculations without using pen/ paper

  • A Proven Method for Brain Development

  • Improve Memory, Concentration, and Visualization Capabilities

  • Enhanced Analytical and Cognitive Skills

Watch our students doing Mental Maths

Game-based Learning Application

Take Advantage of our Game-based Abacus Learning Application. Children enjoy attending live classes and doing homework because of attractive games and other learning features.

Testimonials

A student image with holding an Abacus tool beside his positive testimonial about Relearn's online Abacus mental maths classes
pngaaa_edited.png

Abhishek, Jersey City

Mental maths keeps me sharp and confident. I enjoy my maths classes. Teachers are nice.
Lower 3.jpg
Login Background-min.png
Book a trial- home

BOOK A TRIAL CLASS

  • Free

    Trial Class

    Be sure that your child is loving it
    Valid for 7 days
    • One-to-One Live Mental Maths Class (30 to 45 mins)
    • Choose your preferred day and time for Trial class
    • Know about Mental Maths
    • Know how much your child enjoys it
    • Plan your child's learning path with teacher
Book a trial class Anchor
  • Level 1
    Duration- 14 Weeks "What will be taught?" Via Finger Abacus & Abacus tool Method: 1 to 99 numbers Addition & subtraction Abacus Combination Concepts- +5 combination + 5 combinations and + 10 combinations Via Mental Math Method: Mental Math Basics- Visualization of beads Mental Addition & Subtraction- Non combination (Up to 99) "Outcome in Children" Upon the completion of Level 1, the children shall be able to do; Addition and subtraction of 2 digits numbers via Finger Abacus Method and on the Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Addition & Subtraction of 2 digits numbers (non combination only) For example- Children shall be able to do the below given calculations on the Fingers and the Abacus tool; 5 + 13 + 9 + 31 + 29 =? 26 + 3 - 15 + 56 =? 56 + 10 - 15 + 14 =? & Mental calculation of 2 digits numbers addition & subtraction (non-combination).
  • Level 2
    Duration- 12 Weeks "What will be taught?" Via Finger Abacus & Abacus tool Method: Addition & subtraction up to 99 Abacus Combination Concepts- -10 combinations, Double combinations. Multiplication- 2 digits x 1 digit Via Mental Math Method: Addition & subtraction- +5 combination, -5 combination (+10 combinations) "Outcome in Children" Upon the completion of Level 2, the children shall be able to do; All type of addition and subtraction of 2 digits numbers via Finger Abacus Method and via the Abacus tool. Multiplication of 2-digit numbers by 1-digit numbers via Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Addition and Subtraction of 2 digit numbers. For example- Children shall be able to do the below given calculations; 87 + 18 + 57 + 62 + 89 =? 94 + 76 - 67 + 46 - 32 =? & 89 x 9 =? 67 x 7 =? 46 x 8 =? & Mental calculation of 2 digits numbers addition & subtraction (non-combination & combination both). Example below; 66-1+21+11 (Mentally) 39-5-11+21 (Mentally)
  • Level 3
    Duration- 12 Weeks "What will be taught?" Via Abacus tool Method: Addition & subtraction- 2 & 3 digits calculations (mixed combinations) Decimal addition and subtraction- Up to 3 digits Multiplication- 2 digits x 1 digit, 3 digits x 1 digit and 4 digit x 1 digit Via Mental Math Method: Addition & subtraction- 2 digits (all combinations) Multiplication- 2 digits x 1 digit, 3 digits x 1 digit "Outcome in Children" Upon the completion of Level 3, the children shall be able to do; All type of addition and subtraction of 2 and 3 digits numbers via Finger Abacus Method and via the Abacus tool. Decimal Addition and subtraction for up to 3 digits numbers. Multiplication of 2 digit, 3 digit and 4 digit numbers by 1-digit numbers via Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- 2 digits addition and subtraction without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Multiplication of 2 digits numbers by 1 digit numbers and 3 digits numbers multiplied by 1 digit numbers without using Abacus tool. For example- Children shall be able to do the below given calculations; 586 + 259 + 57 + 83 - 278=? 259 + 574 - 663 + 57 - 176=? & 289.28 + 46.85 - 54.89=? 127.76 + 29.87 - 88.34=? & 4768 x 9=? 384 x 7=? 9475 x 8=? & Mental Calculations 96 + 64 - 25 + 85 =? (Mentally) 86 x 8 =? (Mentally) 846 x 6 =? (Mentally)
  • Level 4
    Duration- 12 Weeks "What will be taught?" Via Abacus Method: Addition & subtraction- 2, 3 & 4 digits (all combinations) Decimals calculation- up to 4 digits (all combinations) Multiplication- (3 & 4 digits x 1 digit) and (2 digits x 2 digits) Division- 2, 3 and 4 digits ÷ 1 digits Via Mental Math Method: Mental Calculation- Upto 3 digits addition and subtraction without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Upto 3 digits decimal addition and subtraction without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Multiplication of upto 4 digits numbers multiplied by 1 digit without using Abacus tool. "Outcome in Children" Upon the completion of Level 4, the children shall be able to do; All type of addition and subtraction of 2 and 3 and 4 digits numbers on the Abacus tool. Decimal Addition and subtraction for upto 4 digits numbers. Multiplication of upto 4 digit numbers by 1 digit and 2 digit numbers on the Abacus tool. Divide upto 4 digits numbers by 1 digit numbers on the Abacus tool. They will start doing metal calculations of basic 2 digit numbers without using Fingers or the Abacus tool. For example- Children shall be able to do the below given calculations; 8654 + 5735 + 835 - 1864 - 4278 =? 7632 + 9846 - 6573 + 135 - 2176 =? & 1324.84 + 2464.37 - 756.98 =? 2756.16 + 89.64 - 764.83 =? & 2346 x 36 =? 1364 x 46 =? & 7458 ÷ 6 =? 8729 ÷ 8=? & Mental Calculations 632 + 114 - 325 + 85 =? (Mentally) & 243.34 + 523.74 -364.73 =? (Mentally) & 7452 x 8 =? (Mentally)
  • Level 5
    Duration- 12 Weeks "What will be taught?" Via Abacus Method: Addition & subtraction- 3 & 4 digits (all combinations) Multiplication- (2 digits x 2 digits, 3 digits × 2 digits) Division- 3 digits ÷ 1 digit, 4 digits ÷ 1 digit, 3 digit ÷ 2 digits and 4 digits ÷ 2 digits Via Mental Math Method: Addition & subtraction- 2 & 3 digits (all combinations) Decimal Addition & subtraction- 4 digits (all combinations) Multiplication- 3 digits x 1 digit, 4 digits × 1 digit, 2 digits x 2 digits Division- 2 digits ÷ 1 digit, 3 digits ÷ 1digit, 4 digits ÷ 1digit "Outcome in Children" Upon the completion of Level 5, the children shall be able to do; All type of addition and subtraction of upto 4 digits numbers on the Abacus tool. Decimal Addition and subtraction for upto 4 digits numbers. Multiplication of upto 4 digit numbers by 1 digit and upto 3 digits numbers by 2 digits numbers. Divide upto 4 digits numbers by 1 digit numbers on the Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Upto 3 digits addition and subtraction without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Upto 4 digits decimal addition and subtraction without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Multiplication of upto 4 digit numbers by 1 digit and 2 digit numbers by 2 digit numbers without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Dividing upto 4 digit numbers by 1 digit numbers without using Abacus tool. For example- Children shall be able to do the below given calculations; 7624 + 5627 + 745 - 5343 - 1263 =? & 6736.84 + 1524.54 - 1634.85 =? 5463.87 + 725.96 - 1264.44 =? & 7464 x 6 =? 737 x 77 =? & 8464 ÷ 8 =? & Mental Calculations 632 + 114 - 325 + 85 =? (Mentally) & 243.34 + 523.74 - 364.73 =? (Mentally) & 7452 x 8 =? (Mentally) & 6912 ÷ 8 (Mentally)
  • Level 6
    Duration- 12 Weeks "What will be taught?" Via Abacus Method: Addition & subtraction- 4 and 5 digits (all combinations) Multiplication- 4 digits x 2 digits Division- 3 digits ÷ 2 digits, 4 digits ÷ 2 digits and 5 digits ÷ 2 digits Fractions Conversion BODMAS Via Mental Math Method: Addition & subtraction- 2 & 3 digits (all combinations) Decimal- 4 digits (all combinations) Multiplication- 2 digits x 2 digits, 3 digits × 2 digits Division- 4 digits ÷ 1 digit, 3 digits ÷ 2 digits Fractions conversion "Outcome in Children" Upon the completion of Level 6, the children shall be able to do; All type of addition and subtraction of upto 5 digits numbers on the Abacus tool. Decimal Addition and subtraction for upto 4 digits numbers on the Abacus tool. Multiplication of upto 4 digit numbers multiplied by 2 digits on the Abacus tool. Divide upto 5 digits numbers by 2 digit numbers on the Abacus tool. Converting fractions in percentages Solving BODMAS based calculations Mental Calculation- Upto 3 digits addition and subtraction without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Upto 4 digits decimal addition and subtraction without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Multiplication of upto 4 digit numbers by 1 digit and 3 digit numbers by 2 digit numbers without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculations- Dividing upto 4 digit numbers by 1 digit numbers and 3 digit numbers by 2 digit numbers without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculations- Doing Fraction conversions without using the Abacus tool. For example- Children shall be able to do the below given calculations; 98456 + 6343 + 12565 - 63424 - 12534 =? & 7453.53 + 3644.74 - 6443.74 =? & 7846 x 68 =? & 65636 ÷ 6 =? & Fraction calculations & 14 + (8 – 2 × 3) =? 2 + 4 ÷ (22 + 6) × 2 =? & Mental Calculations 632 + 114 - 325 + 85 =? (Mentally) & 243.34 + 523.74 -364.73 =? (Mentally) & 7452 x 8 =? (Mentally) & 6912 ÷ 8 (Mentally) & Fraction Conversions (Mentally)
  • Level 7
    Duration- 12 Weeks "What will be taught?" Via Abacus Method: Addition & subtraction- 4 and 5 digits (all combinations) Decimal- 5 digits (all combinations) Multiplication- 3 digits × 3 digits, 4 digits × 2 digits Division- 4 digits ÷ 2 digits, 5 digits ÷ 2 digits Fractions combined operations Percentage Via Mental Math Method: Addition & subtraction- 2 & 3 digits (all combinations) Multiplication- 3 digits x 2 digits Division- 4 digits ÷ 1 digits, 3 digits ÷ 2 digits Decimal addition & subtraction Decimal multiplication Decimal divisions Fractions "Outcome in Children" Upon the completion of Level 7, the children shall be able to do; All type of addition and subtraction of upto 5 digits numbers on the Abacus tool. Decimal Addition and subtraction for upto 5 digits numbers on the Abacus tool. Multiplication of upto 4 digit numbers multiplied by 3 digits on the Abacus tool. Divide upto 5 digits numbers by 2 digit numbers on the Abacus tool. Converting fractions Percentages Mental Calculation- Upto 3 digits addition and subtraction without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Multiplication of upto 4 digit numbers by 1 digit and 2 digit numbers by 2 digit numbers without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Dividing upto 4 digit numbers by 1 digit numbers without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Upto 4 digits decimal addition and subtraction without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Decimal multiplication of upto 4 digits Mental Calculation- Decimal divisions of upto 2 digits Mental Calculation- Fraction mental calculations For example- Children shall be able to do the below given calculations; 98456 + 6343 + 12565 - 63424 - 12534 =? & 7453.53 + 3644.74 - 6443.74 =? & 7846 x 68 =? & 65636 ÷ 6 =? & Fraction calculations & Solving percentages & 14 + (8 – 2 × 3) =? 2 + 4 ÷ (22 + 6) × 2 =? & Mental Calculations 632 + 114 - 325 + 85 =? (Mentally) & 243.34 + 523.74 - 364.73 =? & 7452 x 8 =? (Mentally) & 6912 ÷ 8 =? (Mentally) & 896 ÷ 32 =? (Mentally) & 236.82 + 63.45 - 34.86 =? (Mentally) & 64.34 x 24 =? (Mentally) & 84.32 ÷ 6 =? (Mentally) & Fraction calculations (Mentally)
  • Level 8
    Duration- 12 Weeks "What will be taught?" Via Abacus Method: Addition & subtraction- 4 and 5 digits (all combinations) Division- 5 digits ÷ 2 digits Square roots- 3 and 4 digits combined operations Via Mental Math Method: Addition & subtraction- 3 and 4 digits (all combinations) Mixed calculations (÷, - , x, +) with BODMAS rule Multiplication- 3 digits × 2 digits Division- 4 digits ÷ 1 digit, 3 digits ÷ 2 digits Decimal Addition & subtraction- 5 digits (all combinations) Decimal multiplication Decimal divisions Fractions "Outcome in Children" Upon the completion of Level 8, the children shall be able to do; All type of addition and subtraction of upto 5 digits numbers on the Abacus tool. Decimal Addition and subtraction for upto 5 digits numbers on the Abacus tool. Square roots upto 4 digits on the Abacus tool Multiplication of upto 4 digit numbers multiplied by 3 digits on the Abacus tool. Divide upto 5 digits numbers by 2 digit numbers on the Abacus tool. Percentages on the Abacus tool Mental Calculation- Upto 4 digits addition and subtraction without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- BODMAS based calculations without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Multiplication of upto 4 digit numbers by 1 digit and 3 digit numbers by 2 digit numbers without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Dividing upto 4 digit numbers by 1 digit numbers & 3 digit numbers by 2 digit numbers without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Upto 5 digits decimal addition and subtraction without using Abacus tool. Mental Calculation- Decimal multiplication of upto 4 digits Mental Calculation- Decimal divisions of upto 2 digits Mental Calculation- Fraction mental calculations For example- Children shall be able to do the below given calculations; 98456 + 6343 + 12565 - 63424 - 12534 =? & 7453.53 + 3644.74 - 6443.74 =? & 7846 x 68 =? & 65636 ÷ 6 =? & Solving percentages & 14 + (8 – 2 × 3) =? 2 + 4 ÷ (22 + 6) × 2 =? & √(7396) =? & 5474 + 8462 - 763 + 164 =? (Mentally) & 84 + (23 – 12 × 6) =? (Mentally) 22 + 34 ÷ (12 + 2) × 42 =? (Mentally) & 243.34 + 523.74 -364.73 =? (Mentally) & 7452 x 8 =? (Mentally) 843 x 24 =? (Mentally) & 4537.74 + 2384.21 - 3482.12 =? (Mentally) & 6345.22 x 8 (Mentally) & 84.21 ÷ 7 =? (Mentally) & Fraction Conversions (Mentally)
bottom of page